**Multiplication by series of 1’s to any number**

Here we apply Easy Vedic method for specific multiplication by series of 1 i.e. **multiply by 11,111,1111 etc**. **by fast & easy way**. I have explain first example of each type step by step to understand the method, so read it 2 or 3 time carefully. once you got the trick you can solve such specific multiplication in **9 to 10 time faster than regular method.**

**Case 1: ****Vedic method of Multiplication when multiply by 11**

**a) Two digit in multiplicand **

**Ex. i) 62 x 11**

**step 1:** First write the right-hand side of multiplicand as it is in right hand side of the answer

**Step 2:** Now we add both digit of multiplicand i.e. 6 + 2 = 8, this is middle digit of our answer,

**Step 3:** Finally write left hand side digit of multiplicand as it is in LHS of answer,

**Answer, 62 x 11 = 682**

**Ex. ii) 43 x 11**

** **

** **** **

**Answer, 43 x 11 = 473**

**Ex. iii) 95 x 11**

9_{1}45 = 1045

**Answer,** **95 x 11 = 1045**

**b) 3- digit in multiplicand**

**Ex. iv) 432 x 11**

**Step 1:** we write 2 as it is in left hand side

**Step 2:** Now we add 2 & 3 for next digit of ans.

**Step 3:** Now add 3 & 4 for the next digit of the ans.

**Step 4:** Now write 4 as it is in right hand side of the ans.

**Answer,** **432 x 11 = 4752**

**v) 629 x 11**

**Answer, 629 x 11 = 6919**

**Similarly**,

**vi) 2463 x 11**

Note: As two 1’s in multiplier i.e. 11 so, we add maximum 2-digit at time from right to left. if multiplier will be 111 then we add maximum 3-digit at a time & so on …..as explained below.

**Case 2: ****Vedic method of Multiplication when multiply by 111**

**vii) 402 x 111**

**Step 1:** write 2 as it is in RHS

**Step 2:** Add 0 & 2 for next digit of the ans.

**Step 3:** now add 2, 0 & 4 for next digit of the ans (As three 1 in multiplier so we add 3 digit at a time)

**Step 4:** Add 0 & 4 for next digit of the ans.

**Step 5**: Now write 4 as it is in LHS

**Answer,** **402 x 111 = 44622**

**Ex. viii) 263127 x 111**

**Step 1:** write 7 as it is in RHS

**Step 2:** add 2 & 7, = 9

**Step 3:** add 1,2 & 7 = 10, so write 0 & carryover 1

**Step 4:** now add 2, 1 & 3 = 6 & add carryover 1 =7

**Step 5:** add 1, 3 & 6 =10, so write 0 in ans & carryover 1

**Step 6:** add 3, 6 & 2 = 11 + carryover 1 = 12, write 2 in the ans & carryover 1

**Step 7:** add 6 & 2 = 8 + carryover 1 = 9

**Step 8:** write 2 as it is in LHS

**Answer, 263127 x 111 = 29207097**

**Similarly,**

**Ex. ix) 120423 x 111**

**Ex. x) 231051 x 1111**

**Case 3: Multiply a number by series of same digits**

This technique is basically a extension of previous technique. Here we multiply a number by series of other numbers like 2 series, 3 series, 4 series….

**Ex. xi) 341 x 222**

We know the method of how to multiply by 111 but we don’t know how to multiply by other number series. But here we can easily convert the number 222 in 111 by applying simple logic.

341 x 222

=341 x 2 x 111 (222= 2 x 111)

= 682 x 111 (341 x 2 = 682)

Now here by applying simple logic our sum is converted into previous method sum, now we can easily solve this by 1 series.

**Ex. xii) 112 x 44**

= 112 x 4 x 11 (4 x 11 =44)

= 448 x 11 (112 x 4 = 448)

**Now solve by 1 series method,**

**Try This:**

i)61 x 11 ii)92 x 11 iii) 142 x 11

iv) 635 x 111 v) 7123 x 111 vi) 7462 x 111

viii) 2153 x 1111

**Also find the following link to study more-**

The technique of learning this vedic method is really very interesting and will be lifetime a big help for not only students but for parents as well…Very approaching

Thank you very much!!